CHILDREN HOPE FOREVER

Charity number: 1138938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 16 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 15 February 2019 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 01 November 2017 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required