CHILDREN HOPE FOREVER

Charity number: 1138938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £350 £0 £8.32k £7.73k £9.56k
Total expenditure £1.59k £751 £7.10k £7.26k £9.50k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A