Financial history STREET SOCCER ACADEMY

Charity number: 1140394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £192.60k £383.06k £254.48k £260.35k £263.12k
Total expenditure £207.92k £343.14k £244.24k £221.30k £231.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £28.49k £21.68k