HOPE PROJECTS (WEST MIDLANDS) LTD

Charity number: 1138402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £238.30k £161.14k £217.21k £272.90k £281.42k
Total expenditure £225.53k £177.82k £191.72k £226.58k £247.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A