Trustees BRITISH CARDIOVASCULAR INTERVENTION SOCIETY
Charity number: 1138385
Charity reporting is up to date (247 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rasha Al-Lamee | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter O'Kane | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sukhjinder Nijjer | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Colin Berry | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Gerald Clesham | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Kharbanda | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Douglas Fraser | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Appleby | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dan McKenzie | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Peter Curzen | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Philip MacCarthy | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Douglas Findlay Muir | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER LUDMAN | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.