MAMA ASHA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147198
Charity reporting is up to date (164 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 November 2021 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 11 November 2021 164 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 January 2020 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 January 2020 244 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 15 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 15 March 2017 On time Download