MAMA ASHA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147198
Charity reporting is up to date (164 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £159.01k £84.78k £59.19k £42.63k £61.23k
Total expenditure £158.37k £92.12k £58.39k £46.03k £60.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.81k