BRISTOL CONCERT WIND BAND

Charity number: 1142960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 February 2020 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required