Financial history THE LONDON PATHWAY

Charity number: 1138741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £864.23k £948.95k £730.63k £1.35m £1.41m
Total expenditure £850.94k £885.16k £807.07k £1.06m £1.01m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £3.50k
Income from government grants £78.63k £9.19k £52.83k £220.78k £19.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £16.49k £61.64k £50.30k £157.47k £191.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £847.74k £887.31k £680.33k £1.19m £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £850.94k £885.16k £807.07k £1.06m £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £218
Expenditure - Governance £7.70k £8.38k £8.46k £79.70k £16.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0