Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WREN ACADEMY

Charity number: 1139015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 September 2020 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 September 2020 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required