BRAINTREE YOUTH PROJECT CHARITY

Charity number: 1139014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matt Farmer Trustee 19 March 2019 None on record
Richard David Wearmouth Trustee 14 July 2020 None on record
DAVID JOHN HUXTER Trustee 10 March 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRAINTREE ST MICHAEL Received: On time
Graham Goodchild Trustee 19 March 2019 None on record
Anna England Trustee 02 October 2013 None on record
Penny Smith Trustee 19 March 2019 None on record
ANDREW LEONARD EAST Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record