AL HABIB WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 07 May 2021 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 30 March 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 13 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 18 June 2018 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 24 June 2017 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required