Trustees CHANGING LIVES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1139983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gordon Dunn Chair 21 September 2016
None on record
Brian Michael Clarke Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Susan Therese Taylor BEM Trustee 07 June 2021
None on record
Sarah Marie Tilling Trustee 29 May 2019
None on record
Peter Price Trustee 29 May 2019
None on record
Heidi Elizabeth Lesley Dilliway-Nickson Trustee 18 February 2016
None on record