SYTCHAMPTON ENDOWED PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1139052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £3.75k £4.12k £8.26k £6.98k £7.51k
Total expenditure £984 £3.64k £8.12k £4.27k £2.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A