Charis Ministries Africa

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have 2 missionaries currently working in the Inhambane Province of Mozambique. Our work is predominantly with the vulnerable, including the elderly, orphans, sick, disabled and homeless. We seek to demonstrate the practical love of God and neighbour and communicate the Gospel of Jesus Christ.We partner with Aglow, facilitating the growth of small interdenominational groups in the bush areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Ethiopia
- Mozambique
Governance
- 08 November 2010: Standard registration
- CHARIS MINISTRIES; MINISTRIES OF GRACE; MINISTERIO D-ÇÖA GRACA (Working name)
- CHARIS MINISTRIES MOZAMBIQUE (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MS MEL WELCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Sleightholme | Trustee | 23 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Welch | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE OKPOTI | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ROWLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANDY HUNTER RGN/RM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.60k | £47.44k | £73.51k | £85.86k | £122.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.80k | £39.60k | £83.66k | £84.59k | £80.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 22 SEPTEMBER 2010 as amended on 23 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN MOZAMBIQUE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST; 2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND IN MOZAMBIQUE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
MOZAMBIQUE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SUNNYSIDE AVENUE
WILPSHIRE
BLACKBURN
BB1 9LW
- Phone:
- 07516217349
- Email:
- MELWEL72003@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
charisafrica.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window