Accounts and annual returns TODAY AND TOMORROW

Charity number: 1141972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 February 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 April 2018 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required