Financial history TODAY AND TOMORROW

Charity number: 1141972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.34k £146 £4.84k £200 £571
Total expenditure £8.92k £1.09k £4.61k £563 £2.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A