SPEAK TO ME FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling & Mediation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Standard registration
- GOOD HUMAN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YOGESH APTE | Chair | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.13k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £17.10k | £7.58k | £16.04k | £9.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 April 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 13 April 2025 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/05/2013
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF WOMEN OF INDIAN ORIGIN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, POVERTY OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF THEIR ABUSE OR ABANDONMENT PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL ADVICE AND REPRESENTATION FOR THOSE UNABLE TO AFFORD SUCH ADVICE THROUGH LACK OF MEANS 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG WOMEN AND CHILDREN OF ASIAN ORIGIN BY PROVIDING ADVOCACY, HEALTH/HOUSING ADVICE AND EDUCATION 3) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 144
8 SHEPHERD MARKET
LONDON
W1J 7JY
- Phone:
- 07772942603
- Website:
-
WWW.STMUK.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window