Financial history RIDING MILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 501316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £69.53k £43.03k £58.26k £44.44k £51.08k
Total expenditure £69.64k £74.93k £33.29k £25.00k £37.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £2.50k £25.60k £25.50k £13.88k