THE CONGOLESE ASSOCIATION OF MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 1157149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 September 2019 29 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2018 14 January 2020 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2016 10 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 25 March 2016 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required