THE CONGOLESE ASSOCIATION OF MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 1157149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 27/09/2016 27/09/2017 27/09/2018 27/09/2019
Total gross income £0 £5.06k £24.32k £12.37k £12.18k
Total expenditure £0 £4.95k £23.50k £12.07k £10.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A