NETWORK FOR ANIMALS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1142700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 16 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 12 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 12 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 07 November 2019 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 07 November 2019 38 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 27 November 2018 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 27 November 2018 58 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required