BEDLINOG MINERS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1138941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.16k £4.45k £4.78k £3.12k £2.05k
Total expenditure £16.41k £4.62k £3.29k £3.65k £4.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A