THE FRIENDS OF THETFORD DAD'S ARMY MUSEUM

Charity number: 1139465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.23k £11.66k £8.20k £7.52k £5.35k
Total expenditure £21.44k £19.16k £18.18k £17.52k £15.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A