THE RAINFOREST FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1138287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 August 2017 On time Download