CROYDON ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1141001
Charity reporting is up to date (93 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 01 June 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 01 June 2021 93 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 29 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 26 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 31 July 2017 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 31 July 2017 153 days late Download