Financial history NEWCASTLE CHINESE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1139735
Charity reporting is overdue by 46 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2018 01/07/2019 01/07/2020 01/07/2021 01/07/2022
Total gross income £40.34k £44.65k £31.42k £28.49k £30.16k
Total expenditure £39.61k £51.76k £24.11k £21.91k £32.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A