DEBRE MEDHANIT KIDANE MEHRET ERITREAN CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHDO CHURCH IN UK LTD

Charity number: 1140966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £249.32k £235.88k £224.37k £224.64k £260.13k
Total expenditure £101.61k £84.38k £88.60k £72.24k £81.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A