THE ARTHUR MATYAS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply capital and income to or towards or for the benefit or furtherance of such charitable purposes or charitable institutions according to English law at their absolute discretion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 November 2010: Standard registration
- THE ARTHUR MATYAS & EDWARD WOJAKOVSKI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD WOJAKOVSKI | Trustee | 24 March 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110 | £115 | £120 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.24k | £3.12k | £152 | £16.02k | £6.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 MARCH 2010 as amended on 04 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. IT IS RECOGNISED THAT THE DEFINITION OF WHAT IS "CHARITABLE" ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW CHANGES OVER TIME AND IT IS INTENDED THAT (WHILST NOTHING SHOULD BE DONE WHICH IS NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT THE DATE THAT IT IS DONE) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHOULD CHANGE IN LINE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND SO THAT IN FUTURE THINGS MAY BE DONE (WHEN THEY ARE CHARITABLE) WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE AT THE DATE OF THE TRUST DEED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O TONSTATE LIMITED
3 PARK PLACE
LONDON
SW1A 1LP
- Phone:
- 02074935357
- Email:
- arrematy@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window