Trustees ENFIELD CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1140089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIM HELLINGS Chair 21 November 2012
None on record
Caroline Bernard-Moxey Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Ann Campbell Trustee 06 July 2021
None on record
Patience Wilson Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Amanda Flexman Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Pamela Learmonth Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Pamela Odukoya Trustee 21 November 2019
None on record
Hannah Lison Trustee 21 November 2019
None on record
Neil Yeomans Trustee 05 March 2018
PROJECT GIRL FOUNDATION
Overdue by 674 days
EMPOWERING VULNERABLE CHILDREN ( EVC ) UGANDA
Received: On time
CREST WALTHAM FOREST
Overdue by 4 days
THE JOHN HAMPDEN WAR MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
TAPESTRY CARE UK
Received: On time