BARNSLEY INDEPENDENT ALZHEIMER'S AND DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity number: 1140201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £154.45k £256.19k £332.55k £317.64k £483.99k
Total expenditure £167.89k £283.62k £264.07k £289.80k £445.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £29.26k