Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, HENHAM
Charity number: 1139750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP PAUL Hicks | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stuart-Robinson Peter | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Louis Wilson | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Debra Packford | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Derek Ward | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Annabel Cottam | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Malcolm McFrederick | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Justin Dean Brister | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Shirley Wilcock | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Turner | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
roger hughes-penney | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD NEVILLE PEAKE BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DR STEPHEN CECIL BAZLINTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SIMON HUMPHREY WESTLAND PILCHER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CATHERINE JANE WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ISOBEL MARY BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.