ALFURQAN EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1142790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.12m £781.00k £468.96k £600.10k £589.14k
Total expenditure £627.09k £740.72k £614.72k £647.51k £785.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £613.98k £175.95k N/A £210.21k £262.46k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £333.14k £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £283.92k N/A £138.15k £115.34k
Income - Other £172.21k £321.13k N/A £251.74k £211.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £477.67k £740.72k N/A £647.51k £785.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds £31.85k £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £52.61k £43.23k N/A £16.43k £10.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £120.67k N/A £39.83k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £117.58k £0 N/A £0 £0