Trustees CARDIFF METROPOLITAN UNIVERSITY
Charity number: 1140762

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Edward Taylor CBE | Chair | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER DUNCAN KENNEDY | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Iva Gray | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Fergus Gerard Feeney | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kellie Louise Beirne | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen Jane Marshall OBE | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Frances Glennan | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rewathi Viswanatham | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Elizabeth Bull | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalia-Mia Roach | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Kirsty Ann Palmer | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marie Fiagbe | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Thorne | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Tossell | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Roisin Lara Connolly | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pilgrim | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Menai Peris Owen-Jones | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Matthews | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Scott Waddington | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Warrender | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nick Capaldi OBE | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Cara Aitchison | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.