GREAT LINFORD WATERSIDE FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In order to achieve its charitable objectives the organisation stages an annual free open-air event over 3 days to celebrate a sense of community, local heritage and environment. The event is created to appeal to a range of ages and cultures through: music, creative activities, dance, sport and food
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 07 April 2011: Standard registration
- 25 January 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.51k | £44.36k | £28.66k | £29.49k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.86k | £23.20k | £23.98k | £24.90k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 28 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 23 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 23 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 07 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 07 October 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/03/2011
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND THE ARTISTIC TASTE OF THE PUBLIC; AND 2 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT LINFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
GREAT LINFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window