Financial history ADAPT PREMBABIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1138777
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £52.87k £34.54k £53.25k £67.46k £41.12k
Total expenditure £45.89k £44.41k £44.30k £43.74k £44.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £13.43k £14.71k