UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1139656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 02 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 03 March 2017 On time Download