UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1139656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing University of Bristol students with social, sporting and volunteering opportunities, advice, support and democratic representation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • UBSU (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NOELLE RUMBALL Chair 10 May 2016
EASTSIDE COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
CREATIVE YOUTH NETWORK
Received: On time
Varenya Mehrotra Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Lucy Pears Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Shraddha Chaudhary MICL Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Kate Poyner Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Kreeshi Shavdia Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Mia Stevens Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Ella Lovibond Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Linlu Ye Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Gurvin Chopra Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Helen West Trustee 23 December 2023
None on record
Dr Stephanie Harris Trustee 23 December 2023
None on record
Sude Capoglu Trustee 17 June 2023
None on record
Leonardo Coppi Trustee 17 June 2023
None on record
Bakhtawar Javed Trustee 17 June 2023
None on record
Lucinda Parr Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.12m £3.87m £6.06m £6.68m £6.82m
Total expenditure £4.87m £3.73m £5.91m £6.34m £6.67m
Income from government contracts £1.05k £300 £535 N/A £1.08k
Income from government grants £78.57k £16.40k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.64m £2.68m £3.12m £3.49m £3.26m
Income - Other trading activities £81.24k £0 £0 £127.89k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.34m £1.19m £2.94m £3.06m £3.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.95k £4.23k £4.91k £12.36k £59.51k
Income - Other £53.68k £1.05k £58 £0 £173
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.80m £3.73m £5.91m £6.34m £6.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £22.28k £31.93k £35.05k £43.57k £38.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £62.54k £0 £0 £0 £11.11k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £47.58k £38.60k £47.21k £75.26k £95.02k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £498.45k
Other assets £1.71m £1.90m £2.16m £2.51m £2.41m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £372.66k £397.23k £507.00k £552.13k £817.68k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 11 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 11 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 20 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 09 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
University Bristol Students' Union
Senate House
Tyndall Avenue
BRISTOL
BS8 1TH
Phone:
01173318600