Trustees UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1139656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOELLE RUMBALL | Chair | 10 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Stephanie Harris | Trustee | 23 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen West | Trustee | 23 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timber Hill JP | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sude Capoglu | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Gibbs | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Formby | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leonardo Coppi | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bakhtawar Javed | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Parr | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Dunn | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Antoine | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saranya Thambirajah | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Russell | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Azrai Bin Mohammad Uzir Michael | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rajnish Razdan | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.