AL HUDA EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities for the charity remain the same since inception.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Luton
Governance
- 19 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHMEDNOR ABDULLAHI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ismail Said Jama | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faysal Mohamoud Aden | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.55k | £12.41k | £38.12k | £39.19k | £41.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.49k | £16.05k | £21.13k | £32.56k | £32.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 11 November 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 11 November 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 12 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 06 December 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
198B LEAGRAVE ROAD
LUTON
LU3 1JD
- Phone:
- 01582584441
- Email:
- alhudaluton@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window