Accounts and annual returns GOD IS ABLE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1139268
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 July 2022 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 25 July 2022 116 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 July 2022 481 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 25 July 2022 481 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 01 October 2019 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 05 June 2019 431 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required