Gap Supported Housing

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support vulnurable adults both homeless and those threatened by homelessness. We provide short term supported accommodation for up to seven adults. This service provides 24 hour support and offers the opportunity for individuals to look at the issues that contributed to their homelessness. We deliver basic living skills and employability training and assist in finding long term accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northumberland
Governance
- 27 October 2010: Standard registration
- 28 May 2014: Funds received from 1073209 STOPGAP
- STOPGAP SUPPORTED HOUSING (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Costello | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER HENRY BRINTON | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Keda Norman | Trustee | 10 October 2012 |
|
|||||||
ROSEMARY EILEEN THEOBALDS | Trustee | 10 October 2012 |
|
|||||||
ALLAN BERTRAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.22k | £271.13k | £238.07k | £285.13k | £362.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.90k | £202.16k | £262.26k | £312.02k | £327.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | £30.00k | £32.00k | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 2009 as amended on 15 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO SUPPORT VULNERABLE ADULTS BOTH THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS AND THOSE WHO MAY BE THREATENED WITH HOMELESSNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORTED HOUSING, SUPPORT IN THEIR OWN HOME OR BY SUCH OTHER SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gap Supported Housing
Office 4
4 Meal Market
Hexham
Northumberland
NE46 1NF
- Phone:
- 01434600051
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window