BAILIFF BRIDGE COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1139333
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £90.01k £82.10k £86.69k £81.73k £76.14k
Total expenditure £89.23k £79.96k £85.66k £60.28k £76.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k