Trustees SPEAKERS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1139377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Frances Runham Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Simon John Newton Heale Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Martin Robert Thomas Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Victoria Louise White Trustee 21 February 2019
THE KENNEDY TRUST FOR RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH
Received: On time
Charles Anthony Lesser Trustee 21 February 2019
None on record
Andrew Rawnsley Trustee 21 February 2019
None on record
Hulda Mesilemote Pires Adao HMP Trustee 27 September 2018
None on record
Fiona Wilkinson Huckett Trustee 24 September 2015
None on record