AL-FURQAN ISLAMIC DA'WAH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Current Masjid Activities:- Five times Prayers Jumma?h Khothba Children Qurahan Madrasa Mon-Thu weekend Islamic Studies and Arabic Class Sat Monday Halakah for Brothers Friday Halakah for Brothers after Mahrib Prayer Sunday Halaka for Sisters Tuesday Halaka for Sisters (Aqeeda) Thursday? Thajweed Class for Sisters Sunday Sports Activities for Brothers and Children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- India
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inthisar Mohamed | Chair | 28 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Kabeer Ahmed | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zacky Azhar | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PACKEER BAVA LAFIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rafik Mohammed -- | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED MUNAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.81k | £33.77k | £58.36k | £92.60k | £458.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.36k | £24.02k | £24.80k | £205.77k | £661.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 26 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QUR'AN AND THE TEACHINGS AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM); (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE CLASSES, FACILITIES FOR SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION, COMMUNITY LEARNING PROGRAMMES AND ANY SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (III) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, ORPHANS, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER, CLOTHING, MEDICAL TREATMENT, REHABILITATION, AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS; (IV) TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL AND FAITH GROUPS, IN WAYS THAT CREATES TRUST, UNITY AND PEACE BETWEEN THEM; (V) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS GOOD CITIZENS; (VI) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG POOR PEOPLE, ORPHANS, WIDOWS, THE BLIND, THE DISABLED AND PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR SERVICES FOR TREATMENT, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND COUNSELLING; (VII) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE IN NEED THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masjid Fida
33 Rowsley Street
LEICESTER
LE5 5JN
- Phone:
- 07427442386
- Email:
- fidaleicester@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window