CHRIST ALL NATIONS ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching and sharing the gospel of Jesus Christ. We reach out to young people and offer counselling and support for people within our community and beyond. The church meets every Sunday for Divine Worship service from 12:30pm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hackney
Governance
- 10 January 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MITCHAEL SAWYERR | Chair |
|
||||||
Hawa Conteh | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLAISSA SAWYERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABIBATU SAWYERR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.75k | £27.83k | £33.88k | £49.95k | £72.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.00k | £19.31k | £18.74k | £30.39k | £43.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 November 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
16 November 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS 2. THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITY WORK OF THE CHARITY BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 40
Granard House
Bradstock Road
LONDON
E9 5BN
- Phone:
- 07944042188
- Email:
- PASTORMITCHAEL@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
christallnationsassembly.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window