TLC - ST LUKE'S

Charity number: 1141796
Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 60 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 60 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 01 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 01 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 27 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 July 2017 On time Download