ENFIELD YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PANEL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY DELIVERS CONFLICT RESOLUTION/KNIFE/WEAPON/GANG AWARENESS CLASSES TO PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS. IT PROVIDES MENTORS TO YOUNG PEOPLE. IT RUNS A MUSIC PROJECT, WITH BOTH SCHOOLS AND THE ENFIELD SECONDARY TUITION CENTRE FOR EXCLUDED PUPILS, RESULTING IN ACCREDITED AWARDS. THROUGH ITS WEB SITE AND IN PERSON IT PROVIDES ADVICE ON VARIOUS TOPICS, TO ENSURE THE CORRECT CHOICES ARE MADE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £176,483 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
Governance
- 19 January 2011: Standard registration
- 04 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YEP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.31k | £175.97k | £251.16k | £277.71k | £185.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.31k | £147.40k | £251.73k | £303.33k | £188.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.91k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £231.41k | £176.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 02 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 02 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 13 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 AND LIVING IN ENFIELD IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SUBJECTS AND BENEFITS OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND MEDIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (2) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 AND LIVING IN ENFIELD BY PROVIDING ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE AND BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WITH THE AIM OF:- (A) ADVANCING THEM IN LIFE AND HELPING THEM IN PARTICULAR BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) IMPROVING THEIR SKILLS IN CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND MEDIATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND BY (D) PROVIDING THEM WITH RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (3) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN ENFIELD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED OF THEM, AND/OR ACCESS TO CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
ENFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window