CROSSKEYS SILVER BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As well as competing at both local and national levels in brass band competitions, we provide music for the local community together with music tuition for all ages especially disadvantaged youngsters as well as providing historical information to heritage groups, keeping alive the tradition of colliery bands. We provide concerts for other charities, veteran and senior citizen groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Powys
- Torfaen
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 21 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tomos Rogers | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cllr DAVID MICHAEL GRAY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.19k | £64.66k | £4.74k | £7.18k | £6.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.78k | £27.76k | £12.26k | £13.93k | £7.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
- TO PROMOTE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE MUSICAL ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ART BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES - TO HELP SECURE THE HERITAGE OF THE COLLIERY BRASS BAND TRADITION AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC TO THE IMPORTANCE OF COLLIERY BANDS IN THE DELIVERY OF MUSIC APPRECIATION TO THE PUBLIC IN THE 19TH AND 20TH CENTURIES - TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE AND TUITION IN THE PLAYING OF BRASS BAND INSTRUMENTS IN SOUTH EAST WALES ESPECIALLY WHERE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER CONSIDERATIONS WOULD HAVE A DETRIMENTAL EFFECT ON THE PERSONS' ABILITY TO UNDERTAKE SUCH ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Maryland Road
Risca
Newport
NP11 6BB
- Phone:
- 07903322511
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window