Financial history COMMUNITY WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1139578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £98.18k £75.00k £128.05k £98.60k £94.74k
Total expenditure £105.95k £78.78k £103.51k £100.47k £82.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A